CA AB674 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 524, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 391 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dependent children: documents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-02 - Assembly - AB 674 Bennett Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB674 Bennett By Hurtado (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 674 Bennett Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-05 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 524, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-05 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-10 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2021-09-02AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.).
2021-09-02AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 43. Noes 12.)
2021-09-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-09-01SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2021-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-07-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2021-06-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1716.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-05-19SenateReferred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
2021-05-06SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-06AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1336.)
2021-04-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-04-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 28).
2021-04-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2021-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2021-02-25AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
2021-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2021-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code391Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback