CA AB672 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Jan 20 in State Capitol, Room 4202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 14.7 (commencing with Section 50871) to Part 2 of Division 31 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Publicly owned golf courses: conversion: affordable housing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-01-13AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2022-01-12AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (January 12).
2022-01-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2022-01-03Assembly(pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.)
2022-01-03AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2022-01-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2022-01-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2021-09-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2021-09-09AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2021-04-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2021-04-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2021-03-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-18AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
2021-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2021-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code50871New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback