CA AB671 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 746, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 746, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 50650.3 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
Title
CalHome Program: accessory dwelling units.
Sponsors
Asm. Chris Ward [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Assembly - AB 671 Ward Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB671 Ward et al. By Rubio (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 671 Ward Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB671 Ward et al. By Rubio (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 671 Ward Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 746, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3569.). |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2759.). |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 1897.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 18). |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12). |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2023-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 50650.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |