CA AB67 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 66025.2 of the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public postsecondary education: funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-03AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2014-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2013-05-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
2013-04-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2013-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2013-04-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2013-03-19AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2013-01-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2013-01-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 7.
2013-01-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code66025.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code66170New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback