CA AB67 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-15)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 9 (commencing with Section 89280) to Chapter 2 of Part 55 of Division 8 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to nursing degrees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California State University: Doctor of Nursing Practice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Elections and Redistricting (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-02 From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2010-01-31 Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2010-01-04 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2009-05-04 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 30).
2009-04-27 From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on E. & R. and JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 27).
2009-04-23 Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent.
2009-04-21 Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2009-04-20 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2009-02-05 Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
2008-12-16 Read first time.
2008-12-11 From printer. May be heard in committee January 10.
2008-12-10 Introduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code89280New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback