CA AB666 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on September 3 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 3.6 (commencing with Section 11794.5) to Part 2 of Division 10.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to substance abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substance use disorder workforce development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-03 - Senate - Special Consent AB666 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 666 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2022-01-13SenateOrdered to second reading.
2022-01-13SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2022-01-12SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
2022-01-12SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2022-01-11SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2022-01-11SenateOrdered to third reading.
2022-01-11SenateAction rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
2021-09-07SenateIn Senate. Held at Desk.
2021-09-07AssemblyOrdered to the Senate.
2021-09-07AssemblyWithdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-09-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-09-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.).
2021-08-31SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-07-05SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-06-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.)
2021-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-04-21AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-13AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-04-05AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-15AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-03-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2021-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code11794.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback