CA AB659 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 73.5 and 73.6 to the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans.
Title
Inspector General for Veterans Affairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 73.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 73.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_659&sess=1516&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0651-0700/ab_659_bill_20150224_introduced.html |