CA AB658 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 538, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 538, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 75523 of, and to add Section 22904 to, the Government Code, relating to public employee benefits.
Title
Public employment: retirement: benefits.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Fong [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-12 - Assembly - AB 658 Mike Fong Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB658 Mike Fong By Rubio (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Assembly - AB 658 Mike Fong Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB658 Mike Fong By Rubio (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Assembly - AB 658 Mike Fong Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 538, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-19 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3283.). |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3228.) |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2851.). |
2023-09-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1462.) |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12). |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2023-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 22904 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 75523 | Amended Code | Citation Text |