CA AB654 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 522, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 522, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6325 of, and to amend and repeal Section 6409.6 of, the Labor Code, relating to occupational safety, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
COVID-19: exposure: notification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB654 Reyes By Limón Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Assembly - AB 654 Reyes Third Reading Urgency (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 654 Reyes Third Reading Urgency (Y: 48 N: 22 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Assembly - AB 654 Reyes Third Reading Urgency (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 654 Reyes Third Reading Urgency (Y: 48 N: 22 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 522, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2630.). |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Art. IV, Sec. 8(b) of the Constitution dispensed with. (Ayes 27. Noes 1. Page 2630.) |
2021-09-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (September 10). |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Joint Rules 33.1, 10.5, 61, and 62 suspended. |
2021-09-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 2830.). |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 2626.) |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 2623.) |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 2368.) |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. (Page 2368.) |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Reyes. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 48. Noes 22. Page 1792.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20). |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2021-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 6325 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 6409.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |