CA AB651 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 442, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 442, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7612.11, 7613.1, and 7653.9 of, and to add Section 7688 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 8738 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to cemeteries.
Title
Endowment care cemeteries: examination, investigation, and discipline.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 651 GIPSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB651 Gipson By Hueso (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 651 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB651 Gipson By Hueso (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 651 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 442, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3078.). |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3063.) |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2579.). |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 1766.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 20). |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2021-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7612.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7613.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7653.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7688 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 8738 | Amended Code | Citation Text |