CA AB65 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 25524.1 and 25524.2 of the Public Resources Code, and to add Section 711 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy: nuclear generation facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 3 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2024-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2023-04-11AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
2023-03-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2023-02-15AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2023-02-14AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2023-02-02AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & E.
2023-01-04AssemblyRead first time.
2022-12-07AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
2022-12-06AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code25524.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code25524.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code711New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback