CA AB649 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 492, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 492, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 40403 to the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Department of Resources Recycling and Recovery: Office of Environmental Justice and Tribal Relations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB649 Bennett et al. By Gonzalez (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Assembly - AB 649 Bennett Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Assembly - AB 649 Bennett Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 492, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-29 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 4950.). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 3409.) |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 20). |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 40403 | New Code | See Bill Text |