CA AB648 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1367.13 to the Health and Safety Code, to add Section 10127.6 to the Insurance Code, and to add Section 436 to the Labor Code, relating to wellness programs.
Title
Wellness programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 648 Nazarian Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Employment] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Employment] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 21. Page 3911.) |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 3893.) |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (January 23). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 911.) |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (March 26). |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and L. & E. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10127.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 436 | New Code | See Bill Text |