CA AB638 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-30 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 13. Noes 17. Page 6055.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-30 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 13. Noes 17. Page 6055.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend and repeal Sections 22442.2, 22442.4, 22443.1, 22443.2, and 22443.3 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 22440, 22441, 22441.1, and 22449 of, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend and repeal Section 8223 of the Government Code, relating to immigration consultants.
Title
Immigration consultants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB638 Caballero et al. By Monning (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 638 CABALLERO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 21 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 638 CABALLERO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 21 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 13. Noes 17. Page 6055.). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16). |
2018-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 11). |
2017-06-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 21. Page 1959.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26). |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 18). |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22440 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22441 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22441.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22442.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22442.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22443.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22443.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22443.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22449 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6126.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6126.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 8223 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |