CA AB636 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 697, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 697, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 67380 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Postsecondary education: student safety.
Sponsors
Asm. Jose Medina [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB636 Medina By Liu (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Assembly - AB 636 MEDINA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Assembly - AB 636 MEDINA Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 697, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2279.). |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). |
2015-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and PUB. S. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1390.) |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 5). |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and PUB. S. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 67380 | Amended Code | Citation Text |