CA AB635 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 600, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 600, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 4.6 (commencing with Section 14146) of Chapter 7 of Part 3 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medical interpretation services.
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Assembly - AB 635 ATKINS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB635 Atkins By Pan (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Senate - From Committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 635 ATKINS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB635 Atkins By Pan (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Senate - From Committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 635 ATKINS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 600, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 5. Page 6466.). |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 5421.). |
2016-08-24 | Senate | From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 24). |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Lara. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27). |
2015-07-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 1777.) |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 28). |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14146 | New Code | See Bill Text |