CA AB634 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 818, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 818, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 714.1 and 4600 of, and to add Section 4746 to, the Civil Code, relating to real property.
Title
Real property: solar energy systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-07 - Assembly - AB 634 EGGMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB634 Eggman By Hertzberg (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 634 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB634 Eggman By Hertzberg (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 634 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 818, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 4. Page 3018.). |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 6. Page 2458.). |
2017-08-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-28 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 18). |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2017-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1528.) |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 2). |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1812.503 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 4600 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 4746 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 714 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 714.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |