CA AB632 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 169, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 169, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21628 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to business.
Title
Secondhand dealers and coin dealers: reporting: handheld electronic devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-06 - Assembly - AB 632 EGGMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB632 Eggman (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Assembly - AB 632 EGGMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB632 Eggman (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Assembly - AB 632 EGGMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 169, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-08-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-08-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2015-07-06 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2254.). |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1755.). |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1390.) |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 5). |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 21628 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 21643 | Amended Code | Citation Text |