CA AB63 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 368, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 36710 of the Public Resources Code, relating to marine resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marine resources: Marine Managed Areas Improvement Act: restoration and monitoring activities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-07 - Assembly - AB 63 Petrie-Norris Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB63 Petrie-Norris et al. By Min (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - AB 63 Petrie-Norris Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 368, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-13 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-09-07AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.).
2021-09-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-09-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2021-08-31SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-30SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-19SenateOrdered to third reading.
2021-08-19SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2021-08-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-07-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-06-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-29SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1719.) (June 29).
2021-06-09SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-05-12SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2021-05-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-04-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1250.)
2021-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-04-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 21).
2021-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-01-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2020-12-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code36710Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback