CA AB63 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 74, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 74, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1794.45 to the Civil Code, relating to service contracts.
Title
Service contracts: retailers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB63 Mendoza By Corbett (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-03-23 - Assembly - AB 63 MENDOZA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2009-03-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-06-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-03-23 - Assembly - AB 63 MENDOZA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2009-03-17 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 74, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-08-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-07-30 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2009-07-01 | Withdrawn from Governor. Ordered returned to enrollment. | |
2009-06-25 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2009-06-22 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-06-22 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1374.) | |
2009-06-10 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-09 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 9). | |
2009-05-26 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-03-23 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-03-23 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 624.) | |
2009-03-18 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-03-17 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (March 17). | |
2009-02-05 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | |
2008-12-16 | Read first time. | |
2008-12-10 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 9. | |
2008-12-09 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1794.45 | New Code | See Bill Text |