CA AB626 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 7 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-09-13 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 3016.5 to the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voting: returning vote by mail ballots in person.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB626 Pellerin By Laird (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 626 Pellerin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-13 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2023-09-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2023-09-07SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 4.).
2023-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-09-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
2023-07-03SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
2023-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2023-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2023-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 2.)
2023-05-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 18).
2023-04-19AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2023-03-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-03-20AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2023-03-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 15).
2023-02-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
2023-02-10AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 12.
2023-02-09AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code3016.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback