CA AB624 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 17053.45 and 23645 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income taxes: credit: robotics club donation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 17). |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-14 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23645 | New Code | See Bill Text |