CA AB624 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 11302 and 11319 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to real estate appraisers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real estate appraisers: standards of conduct.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-07-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 624 WILK Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30SenateFrom Senate committee without further action.
2015-07-13SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2015-06-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-06-22SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2015-06-08SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2015-05-28SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2015-05-14SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-05-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1448.)
2015-05-07AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2015-05-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6).
2015-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-22AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2015-04-21AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 21).
2015-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2015-03-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2015-02-25AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
2015-02-24AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code11302Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code11319Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_624&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_624_bill_20150224_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_624_bill_20150326_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_624_bill_20150422_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_624_bill_20150622_amended_sen_v96.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_624_vote_20150421_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_624_vote_20150506_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_624_vote_20150514_1112AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_624_vote_20150629_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0601-0650/ab_624_vote_20150713_000001_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback