CA AB623 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 374, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 374, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 19418.5 to the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 3956, 47020, 75504, 75514, 75531, 75536, 75538, 75539, and 75541 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to agriculture.
Title
State-designated fairs: district agricultural associations: farmers’ markets: California Apple Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-01 - Assembly - AB 623 AGRI. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By RIVAS, R (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB623 AGRI. (Rivas, R.) By Caballero (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 623 AGRI. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB623 AGRI. (Rivas, R.) By Caballero (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 623 AGRI. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 374, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-08 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2646.). |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2625.) |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2226.). |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-17 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1336.) |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2021-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19418.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 3956 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 47020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 75504 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 75514 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 75531 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 75536 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 75538 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 75539 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 75541 | Amended Code | Citation Text |