CA AB623 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 863, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 13105, 13118, 13119, 13120, 13202, 13203, 13204, 13205, 13206, 13206.5, 13208, 13209, 13210, 13211, 13212, 13213, 13214, 13215, 13216, 13216.5, 13217, 13219, 13231, and 13315 of, and to add Section 13218 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections: printing requirements and ballot design.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 623 Berman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB623 Berman By Stern (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 623 Berman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-13 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 863, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-13 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-25AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-12AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3485.).
2019-09-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2019-09-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 2861.).
2019-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-25SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2019-06-11SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-05-22SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2019-05-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1587.)
2019-05-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 1).
2019-02-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2019-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code13105Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13118Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13119Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13120Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13202Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13203Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13204Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13205Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13206Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13206.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13208Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13209Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13210Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13211Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13212Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13213Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13214Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13215Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13216Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13216.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13217Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13218New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code13219Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13231Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code13315Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback