CA AB616 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1156 and 1156.3 of, and to add Sections 1156.35 and 1162 to, the Labor Code, relating to labor relations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agricultural labor relations: labor representative elections: representation ballot card election.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-01 - Assembly - AB 616 Stone Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB616 Stone et al. By Leyva (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Assembly - AB 616 Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 17 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-03AssemblyConsideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
2022-01-03AssemblyConsideration of Governor's veto pending.
2021-09-22AssemblyVetoed by Governor.
2021-09-08 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2021-09-01AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 19.).
2021-08-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-08-26SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 11.).
2021-08-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-07-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2021-06-30SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-06-17SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-19SenateReferred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2021-05-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 17. Page 1360.)
2021-05-06AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 5).
2021-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-23AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-02-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2021-02-13AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
2021-02-12AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code1156Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code1156.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code1156.35New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code1162New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback