CA AB612 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-11 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-11 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 124115.5, 124116, 124116.5, 124118.5, and 124119 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to newborn and infant hearing screening.
Title
Newborns and infants: hearing screening.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 612 RUBIO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1823.) |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 124115.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 124116 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 124116.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 124118.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 124119 | Amended Code | Citation Text |