CA AB612 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]


An act to amend Sections 17935, 17941, 17948, and 23153 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Minimum franchise tax: annual tax: small business.



2016-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2016-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2015-05-18AssemblyRetained in suspense file.
2015-05-04AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
2015-03-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2015-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2015-02-25AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
2015-02-24AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

California State Sources

Bill Comments