CA AB611 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 613, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 613, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 597.9 of, and to repeal and add Section 286.5 of, the Penal Code, relating to sexual abuse of animals.
Title
Sexual abuse of animals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 611 Nazarian Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB611 Nazarian et al. By Wilk (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 611 Nazarian Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB611 Nazarian et al. By Wilk (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 611 Nazarian Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 613, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3139.). |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2586.). |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1190.) |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 3). |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 286.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 597.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |