CA AB61 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 825 and 849 of the Penal Code, and to amend Section 631 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to criminal procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure: arraignment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-01AssemblyDied on inactive file.
2023-06-01AssemblyOrdered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Bryan.
2023-05-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18).
2023-05-03AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2023-04-26AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2023-03-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-03-08AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2023-03-07AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 7).
2023-02-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2023-02-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2023-02-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2023-01-04AssemblyRead first time.
2022-12-07AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
2022-12-06AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code825Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code849Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code631Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback