CA AB608 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 16 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 2069 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical assistants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-16 - Assembly - AB 608 IRWIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-09SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-08-09SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-08-08SenateRe-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-07-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-07-03SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-06SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-15SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-02-13SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-01-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 3779.)
2018-01-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 8).
2018-01-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & F. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-01-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2017-05-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-05-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2017-05-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-04-17AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2017-03-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
2017-02-27AssemblyReferred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and PUB. S.
2017-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2017-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code2069Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code1785.11.11Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1546.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback