CA AB608 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 18911 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to CalFresh.
Title
CalFresh: school meals.
Sponsors
Asm. Richard Gordon [D] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Brian Maienschein [D] |
Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Sen. Loni Hancock [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-22 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Assembly - AB 608 GORDON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Assembly - AB 608 GORDON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1224.) |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18911 | Amended Code | Citation Text |