CA AB603 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12525.4 to the Government Code, relating to law enforcement.
Title
Law enforcement settlements and judgments: reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-07 - Assembly - AB 603 McCarty Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB603 McCarty By Allen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 603 McCarty Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB603 McCarty By Allen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 603 McCarty Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2021-10-08 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2021-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2828.). |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2344.). |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1336.) |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12525.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |