CA AB603 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 706, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 706, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 8227.2 and 8227.7 to the Education Code, relating to child care services.
Title
Child care: alternative payment programs: child care providers: electronic payments: notice of service changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Assembly - AB 603 Quirk-Silva Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB603 Quirk-Silva By McGuire (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 603 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB603 Quirk-Silva By McGuire (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 603 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 706, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 17. Page 3396.). |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2822.). |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 16. Page 1958.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26). |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 8227.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 8227.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 8227.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 8227.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |