CA AB602 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 347, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 65940.1 and 66019 of, and to add Section 66016.5 to, the Government Code, and to add Section 50466.5 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to land use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Development fees: impact fee nexus study.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-08 - Assembly - AB 602 Grayson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB602 Grayson et al. By Caballero (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Housing] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 602 Grayson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 347, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-15 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2021-09-08AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.).
2021-09-08AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 42. Noes 13.)
2021-09-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-09-07SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.).
2021-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-05SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
2021-07-01SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 1).
2021-06-17SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HOUSING.
2021-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-05-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-04AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-05-03AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29).
2021-04-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2021-04-19AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-04-15AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 14).
2021-04-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2021-04-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2021-03-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-18AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
2021-02-12AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
2021-02-11AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65940.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code66016.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code66019Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code50466.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB602
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB602#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB602#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB602#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB602#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB602#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB602#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB602#93AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB602#92ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB602#91CHP
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB602

Bill Comments

feedback