CA AB600 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 295, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 295, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 422.56 of the Penal Code, relating to hate crimes.
Title
Hate crimes: immigration status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-02 - Assembly - AB 600 Arambula Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB600 Arambula By Pan (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 600 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB600 Arambula By Pan (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 600 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 295, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2728.). |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 2703.) |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2295.). |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1822.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 422.56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |