CA AB60 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1029 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 832.7, 832.18, 13503, 13506, 13510, 13510.1, and 13512 of, to amend the heading of Article 2 (commencing with Section 13510) of Chapter 1 of Title 4 of Part 4 of, and to add Sections 13509.5, 13510.8, and 13510.9 to, the Penal Code, relating to law enforcement.
Title
Law enforcement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-12-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 1029 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13503 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13506 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13509.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 13510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13510.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13510.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 13510.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 13512 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 832.18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 832.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |