CA AB598 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8245 and 8246 of, and to add Sections 8248 and 8249 to, the Education Code, relating to child care.
Title
Family child care home education networks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Assembly - AB 598 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Assembly - AB 598 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3504.) |
2016-01-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-01-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-01-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 12). |
2016-01-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 8245 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8246 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8247 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8248 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 8249 | New Code | See Bill Text |