CA AB595 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 66205.4 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: University of California and California State University: student eligibility policy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-20 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Assembly - AB 595 Medina Third Reading Urgency (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Assembly - AB 595 Medina Third Reading Urgency (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 1). |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 3370.). |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 16. Page 3365.) |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 20). |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66205.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |