CA AB594 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-08-12 - In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 30 in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 11546.11 to the Government Code, relating to artificial intelligence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Artificial intelligence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 594 Salas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Employment] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1936.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2019-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2019-03-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-18AssemblyReferred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and L. & E.
2019-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2019-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code11546.11New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback