CA AB59 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 66013, 66014, 66016, 66019, and 66020 of, and to repeal Section 66022 of, the Government Code, relating to land use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mitigation Fee Act: fees: notice and timelines.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2022-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2021-01-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2020-12-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback