CA AB59 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 405, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 405, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25660 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverages: proof of age: military
Sponsors
Asm. Paul Cook [R] | Asm. Chuck de Vore [R] | Asm. Nathan Fletcher [R] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] |
Asm. Danny Gilmore [R] | Asm. Kevin Jeffries [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-09-01 - Assembly - AB 59 JEFFRIES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB59 Jeffries By Denham (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-18 - Assembly - AB 59 JEFFRIES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2009-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB59 Jeffries By Denham (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-18 - Assembly - AB 59 JEFFRIES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 405, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-08 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m. | |
2009-09-01 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2846.) | |
2009-08-27 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-08-27 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1975.) | |
2009-07-13 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-07-09 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2009-07-07 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-07-06 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-06-23 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23). | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2009-05-18 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-18 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 1547.) | |
2009-05-12 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-11 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-05-07 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (May 6). | |
2009-04-23 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (April 22). | |
2009-02-05 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2008-12-08 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 7. Read first time. | |
2008-12-05 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 25660 | Amended Code | Citation Text |