CA AB586 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 49427.1 to the Education Code, relating to pupil health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil health: health and mental health services: School Health Demonstration Project.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 586 O'Donnell Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-23SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH.
2021-06-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.)
2021-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-05-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-19AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-04-15AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 13).
2021-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-03-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2021-03-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-25AssemblyReferred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH.
2021-02-12AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
2021-02-11AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code49427.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback