CA AB584 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 35797 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Transportation: weight limits: special permits.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-03-26AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2021-02-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2021-02-12AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
2021-02-11AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code35797New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback