CA AB58 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 428, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 215 of the Education Code, relating to pupil health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil health: suicide prevention policies and training.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-08-24 - Assembly - AB 58 Salas Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent AB58 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Assembly - AB 58 Salas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-09-19 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 428, Statutes of 2022.
2022-09-19 Approved by the Governor.
2022-08-31 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2022-08-24AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.).
2022-08-24AssemblyAssembly Rule 77(a) suspended.
2022-08-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2022-08-23SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4984.).
2022-08-22SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2022-08-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2022-08-11SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2022-08-11SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
2022-06-20SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2022-06-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-05-04SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2022-01-25SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2022-01-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 3366.)
2022-01-24AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 16. Page 3365.)
2022-01-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2022-01-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 20).
2022-01-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2022-01-13AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2022-01-12AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 12).
2022-01-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2020-12-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code215Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB58
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB58#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB58#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB58#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB58#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB58#95ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB58#94CHP
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB58
Roll Callhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB58

Bill Comments

feedback