CA AB58 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 32280, 32281, 32282, 32286, 32288, and 47605 of, and to add Sections 32286.1 and 32288.1 to, the Education Code, relating to school safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School safety plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 58 RODRIGUEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30SenateFrom Senate committee without further action.
2015-08-27SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2015-08-17SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2015-07-09SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-07-08SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 1).
2015-06-11SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2015-06-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1792.)
2015-06-01AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-28AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2015-04-29AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2015-04-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-20AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2015-04-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 8).
2015-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2015-03-26AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2015-01-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2015-01-05AssemblyRead first time.
2014-12-03AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 2.
2014-12-02AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code32280Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code32281Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code32282Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code32286Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code32286.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code32288Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code32288.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code32289Repealed CodeCitation Text
Education Code32289.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code47605Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_58&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_bill_20141202_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_bill_20150326_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_bill_20150420_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_bill_20150528_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_bill_20150709_amended_sen_v95.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_vote_20150408_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_vote_20150528_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_vote_20150602_0240PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_vote_20150701_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_vote_20150817_000001_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback