CA AB58 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 547, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 24177.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to medical experiments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical experiments: human subjects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB58 Wieckowski By Anderson (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Assembly - AB 58 WIECKOWSKI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-10-04 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 547, Statutes of 2013.
2013-10-04 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-09AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2013-09-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2013-09-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2090.).
2013-06-06SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-06-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 5).
2013-04-18SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2013-04-08SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-04-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 798.)
2013-04-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-04-02AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-04-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (March 19).
2013-02-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2013-02-27AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2013-01-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2013-01-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 7.
2013-01-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code24177.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_58&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_bill_20130107_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_bill_20130227_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_bill_20130402_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_bill_20130905_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_bill_20131004_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_vote_20130319_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_vote_20130408_0114PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_vote_20130605_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_vote_20130903_1230PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback