CA AB58 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 72, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 337a of, and to add Section 336.9 to, the Penal Code, relating to sports betting pools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sports betting pools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-06-29 - Senate - Special Consent #11 AB58 Jeffries (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 58 JEFFRIES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-08-06 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 72, Statutes of 2009.
2009-08-05 Approved by the Governor.
2009-07-30 Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
2009-06-29 In Assembly. To enrollment.
2009-06-29 Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1519.)
2009-06-25 Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
2009-06-24 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-06-23 From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2009-06-09 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9).
2009-05-21 Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2009-05-14 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2009-05-14 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 1460.)
2009-05-11 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-05-07 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 6).
2009-04-22 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21).
2009-04-02 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 18. Noes 1.) (April 1).
2009-02-05 Referred to Coms. on G.O. and PUB. S.
2008-12-08 From printer. May be heard in committee January 7. Read first time.
2008-12-05 Introduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code336.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code337Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_58&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_bill_20081205_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_bill_20090702_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_bill_20090806_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_vote_20090401_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_vote_20090421_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_vote_20090506_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_vote_20090514_1103AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_vote_20090609_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0051-0100/ab_58_vote_20090629_1252PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback