CA AB573 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 6390) to Part 4 of Division 10 of the Family Code, relating to domestic violence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic violence: restraining order Hope Cards.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-02-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2019-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2019-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Code6390New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback