CA AB572 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Referred to Coms. on G.O. and PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 6105 to the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Deforestation-Free Procurement Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 572 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateReferred to Coms. on G.O. and PUB. S.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 1936.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16).
2019-04-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-03-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2019-03-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
2019-02-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2019-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2019-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Contract Code6105New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback